This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 12/17/2018 at 04:19:32 (UTC).

In the Estate of Michael Earl Coghlan, Deceased

Case Summary

On 03/09/2018 In the Estate of Michael Earl Coghlan, Deceased was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, Probate Court #2 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Kelly, Lynn. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********24-2

  • Filing Date:

    03/09/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Kelly, Lynn

 

Party Details

Applicant and Executor

Coghlan, Suzanne Also Known As Coghlan, Suzanne Carol

Grapevine, TX 76051

Decedent

Coghlan, Michael Earl

Arlington, TX 76012

Not Classified By Court

Unknown, Missing, or Incapacitated Heir

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant and Executor Attorney

Timothy Pullen

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/31/2018
  • Affidavit in Lieu of Inventory Doc ID#15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2018
  • Waiver of 308 Doc ID#14: Suzanne Coghlan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • Notice to Creditors Doc ID#13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2018
  • Correspondence Doc ID#12: To Attorney RE: Hearing docs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2018
  • 306 Notice Doc ID#11: Order Probating Will

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2018
  • Oath Doc ID#10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2018
  • Order Admit Will to Probate & Granting Letters Testamentary Doc ID#9: w/o bond

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2018
  • Proof of Subscribing Witness Doc ID#8: Fred Weekley

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2018
  • Proof of Death and other Facts Doc ID#7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2018
  • Probate Of Will Hearing: (2:15 PM) (Judicial OfficerKelly, Lynn) : Result: Order Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 03/12/2018
  • Will - Original Doc ID#5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • Citation - Poster: Return Date 03/26/2018; Public Notice: Served: 03/15/2018; Returned: 03/16/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • Probate Supplemental Case Information Sheet Doc ID#4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • Will - Copy Doc ID#3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • Application for Probate of Will Doc ID#2: Pd $4 JF - Order of No Administration, or in the Alternative Indep Admin w/Letters

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • Civil Case Information Sheet Doc ID#1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2018
  • Counter Payment: Receipt # PR-0343476: Coghlan, Suzanne: (8.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2018
  • Transaction Assessment: 8.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • eFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-81520: Coghlan, Suzanne: (260.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • Financial Information: Applicant Coghlan, Suzanne; Total Financial Assessment: 268.00; Total Payments and Credits: 268.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 260.00

    Read MoreRead Less