Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 06/20/2021 at 06:09:36 (UTC).

In the Estate of Melanie L. Gibson, Deceased

Case Summary

On 04/06/2021 In the Estate of Melanie L Gibson, Deceased was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, Probate Court #1 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Ponder, Christopher W. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********04-1

  • Filing Date:

    04/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Probate Court #1

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Ponder, Christopher W

 

Party Details

Decedent

Gibson, Melanie L.

Not Classified By Court

Unknown, Missing, or Incapacitated Heir

Applicant and Administrator With Will Annexed

Gibson, Julie S.

Arlington, TX 76017

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant and Administrator With Will Annexed Attorney

Jason Michael Amon

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketRequest Index # 13: Request for Letters

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketProof of Death and other Facts Index # 12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketOath Index # 11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • Docket306 Notice Index # 10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketOrder Admitting Will - Appoint Indep Admin w/ Will Annexed Index # 9: w/o Bond

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketProbate Of Will Hearing: (2:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Ponder, Christopher W.) : via zoom / Declination needed from 2IE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketDeclination to Serve Index # 8: and Waiver Michael Latham

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketConsent to Appointment Index # 7: and Waiver of Notice Mary Gibson

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketConsent to Appointment Index # 6: and Waiver of Notice Julie Gibson

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-118179: Gibson, Julie S.: (2.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • FinancialTransaction Assessment: 2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketHearing Setting Letter Index # 5: June 14th, 2021 at 02:00pm via Zoom

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketWill - Original Index # 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-115408: Gibson, Julie S.: (268.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Applicant Gibson, Julie S.; Total Financial Assessment: 270.00; Total Payments and Credits: 270.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 268.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketCitation - Poster: Return Date 4/19/21; Public Notice: Served: 04/08/2021; Returned: 04/09/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketProbate Supplemental Case Information Sheet Index # 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketWill - Copy Index # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketApplication for Indep Admin with Will Annex 401.002b Index # 1: Paid $4 JF & $8 Ltrs

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jason Michael Amon