Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 05/01/2021 at 06:14:37 (UTC).

In the Estate of Maurine Rexroat Padgett, Deceased

Case Summary

On 03/01/2021 In the Estate of Maurine Rexroat Padgett, Deceased was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, Probate Court #2 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Kelly, Lynn. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********66-2

  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Probate Court #2

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Kelly, Lynn

 

Party Details

Decedent

Padgett, Maurine Rexroat

Not Classified By Court

Unknown, Missing, or Incapacitated Heir

Applicant

Padgett, Stacey Maurine

Hurst, TX 76054

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant Attorney

Rebecca A. Covell

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketProbate Of Will Hearing: (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Kelly, Lynn)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-116519: Padgett, Stacey Maurine: (2.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • FinancialTransaction Assessment: 2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketCorrespondence Index # 6: Correspondence Filing Proposed Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketDeclination to Serve Index # 5: and Waiver Gregory Kocian

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketWill - Original Index # 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-113713: Padgett, Stacey: (256.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Applicant Padgett, Stacey Maurine; Total Financial Assessment: 258.00; Total Payments and Credits: 258.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 256.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketCitation - Poster: Return Date 03/15/2021; Public Notice: Served: 03/04/2021; Returned: 03/05/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketWill - Copy Index # 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketProbate Supplemental Case Information Sheet Index # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketApplication for Probate of Will Index # 1: Owes $4 JF and Letters

    Read MoreRead Less