This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 07/05/2022 at 12:40:02 (UTC).

In The Estate of Mary Waunita Vest Barron, Deceased

Case Summary

On 09/16/2021 In The Estate of Mary Waunita Vest Barron, Deceased was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, Probate Court #2 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Allen, Brooke U. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********10-2

  • Filing Date:

    09/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Allen, Brooke U

 

Party Details

Applicant and Executor

Chenoweth, Patti Also Known As Chenoweth, Patricia Barron

Plano, TX 75093

Decedent

Barron, Mary Waunita Vest

Not Classified By Court

Unknown, Missing, or Incapacitated Heir

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant and Executor Attorney

Joseph E. Ackels, JR

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2022
  • Docket306 Notice Index # 13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • DocketOrder Approving Inventory, Appraisment & List of Claims Index # 12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • DocketInventory Appraise Claims -no fee w/in 90 days qualification Index # 11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • DocketNotice to Creditors Index # 10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • Docket306 Notice Index # 9

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • FinancialCounter Payment: Receipt # PR-0366217: Ackels, Joseph E., JR: (8.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • FinancialTransaction Assessment: 8.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketOath Index # 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketOrder Admit Will to Probate & Granting Letters Testamentary Index # 7: without bond

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketProof of Death and other Facts Index # 6

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketAmended Appl for Probate of Will Index # 5: First

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-123888: Chenoweth, Patti: (2.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • FinancialTransaction Assessment: 2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketHearing Setting Letter Index # 4: December 06th, 2021 at 03:00pm

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-122710: CHENOWETH, PATTI: (256.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Applicant Chenoweth, Patti; Total Financial Assessment: 266.00; Total Payments and Credits: 266.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 256.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketWill - Original Index # 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketCitation - Poster: Return Date 10/04/2021 RFC 09/16/2021 3:23 p.m. #057298798; Public Notice: Served: 09/22/2021; Returned: 09/23/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketWill - Copy Index # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketApplication for Probate of Will Index # 1: Owes $4 JF and Letters

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ACKELS, JOSEPH E, Sr.