Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 04/16/2021 at 06:14:54 (UTC).

In the Estate of Mary Glenda Bailey, Deceased

Case Summary

On 03/01/2021 In the Estate of Mary Glenda Bailey, Deceased was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, Probate Court #2 located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********63-2

  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Probate Court #2

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Decedent

Bailey, Mary Glenda

Crowley, TX 76036

Not Classified By Court

Strong, Billy Glen

Fort Worth, TX 76132

Strong, David Paul

North Righland Hills, TX 76182

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court Attorney

B Borden Green

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketCertified Copy Index #7: SEA and Order mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • Docket306 Notice Index #6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketOrder Approving Small Estate Affidavit Index #5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-113696: STRONG, DAVID PAUL: (307.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Distributee Strong, David Paul; Total Financial Assessment: 307.00; Total Payments and Credits: 307.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 307.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketCitation - Poster: Return Date 03/15/2021; Public Notice: Served: 03/04/2021; Returned: 03/05/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketCorrespondence Index #4: Letter to the Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketProbate Supplemental Case Information Sheet Index #3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketMiscellaneous Document Index #2: Death Certificate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketSmall Estate Affidavit Index #1: Pd $24 Non CC, Pd $15 CC Attahced with Proposed Order

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer B Borden Green