Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 04/15/2021 at 06:08:59 (UTC).

In the Estate of Mary Dee Goad Jackson, Deceased

Case Summary

On 03/01/2021 In the Estate of Mary Dee Goad Jackson, Deceased was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, Probate Court #1 located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********71-1

  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Probate Court #1

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Not Classified By Court

Unknown, Missing, or Incapacitated Heir

Applicant

Esparza, Jane Dee Jackson Formerly Known As Jackson, Jane Dee

Fort Worth, TX 76133

Decedent

Jackson, Mary Dee Goad

Fort Worth, TX 76104

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant Attorney

H. Dean Owen, JR

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketWill - Original Index #4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-113721: Esparza, Jane Dee Jackson: (256.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Applicant Esparza, Jane Dee Jackson; Total Financial Assessment: 256.00; Total Payments and Credits: 256.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 256.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketCitation - Poster: Return Date 3/15/21; Public Notice: Served: 03/04/2021; Returned: 03/05/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketProbate Supplemental Case Information Sheet Index #3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketWill - Copy Index #2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketApplication for Probate of Will Index #1: Owes $4 JF & Ltrs

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer H. Dean Owen, JR