This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 04/03/2021 at 06:07:40 (UTC).

In the Estate of Mary Ann Meuret, Deceased

Case Summary

On 03/03/2021 In the Estate of Mary Ann Meuret, Deceased was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, Probate Court #2 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Allen, Brooke U. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********12-2

  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Probate Court #2

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Allen, Brooke U

 

Party Details

Applicants

MARTIN, NANCY LEE

Trophy Club, TX 76262

WHEELER, MARY SUE

Arlington, TX 76012

Martin, Nancy Lee Formerly Known As Meuret, Nancy Lee

Trophy Club, TX 76262

Wheeler, Mary Sue Formerly Known As Wheeler, Mary Sue Meuret

Arlington, TX 76012

Not Classified By Court

Unknown, Missing, or Incapacitated Heir

Decedents

MEURET, MARY ANN

Meuret, Mary Ann Also Known As Meuret, Mary A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant Attorney

Craig A. Bishop

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketProbate Of Will Hearing: (3:10 PM) (Judicial OfficerAllen, Brooke U.) : Email cabishoplaw@gmail.com

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-114653: Martin, Nancy Lee: (4.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • FinancialTransaction Assessment: 4.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketHearing Setting Letter Index #6: 5/10/2021 3:10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketWill - Original Index #5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketCitation - Poster: Return Date 03/15/2021; Public Notice: Served: 03/04/2021; Returned: 03/05/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-113832: MARTIN, NANCY LEE: (268.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Applicant Martin, Nancy Lee; Total Financial Assessment: 272.00; Total Payments and Credits: 272.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 268.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketProbate Supplemental Case Information Sheet Index #4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Information Sheet Index #3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketWill - Copy Index #2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketApplication for Probate of Will Index #1: Pd $4 JF, Pd $8 Letters

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Craig A. Bishop