Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 05/22/2021 at 06:38:26 (UTC).

In the Estate of Marvin E. Gallaway, Deceased

Case Summary

On 04/05/2021 In the Estate of Marvin E Gallaway, Deceased was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, Probate Court #2 located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********98-2

  • Filing Date:

    04/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Probate Court #2

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Decedent

Gallaway, Marvin E.

Applicant

Lewis, Stacy L. Also Known As Lewis, Stacy F.

Arlington, TX 76016

Not Classified By Court

Unknown, Missing, or Incapacitated Heir

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant Attorney

Jason Michael Amon

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketCitation - Poster: Return Date 04/19/2021; Public Notice: Served: 04/08/2021; Returned: 04/09/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketWill - Original Index # 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-115383: Lewis, Stacy L.: (268.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Applicant Lewis, Stacy L.; Total Financial Assessment: 268.00; Total Payments and Credits: 268.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 268.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketProbate Supplemental Case Information Sheet Index # 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketWill - Copy Index # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketApplication for Probate of Will Index # 1: Pd $4 JF Pd $8 Letters

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jason Michael Amon