This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 12/03/2018 at 06:15:04 (UTC).

In the Estate of Mart Gayland Pool, Deceased

Case Summary

On 03/07/2018 In the Estate of Mart Gayland Pool, Deceased was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, Probate Court #1 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is King, Steve M. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********85-1

  • Filing Date:

    03/07/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

King, Steve M

 

Party Details

Claimants

c/o Estate Information Services, LLC

Po Box 1338

Reynoldsburg, OH 43068

American Express National Bank (AENB)

Po Box 1338

Reynoldsburg, OH 43068

Not Classified By Court

Unknown, Missing, or Incapacitated Heir

Applicant and Executor

Sherrod, Colice Kathryn

Fort Worth, TX 76103

Decedent

Pool, Mart Gayland

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant, Executor and Decedent Attorney

Jason Michael Amon

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/31/2018
  • Claim Doc ID#17: $8,848.92 - Notice Letter Sent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • 306 Notice Doc ID#16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • Order Approving Inventory, Appraisment & List of Claims Doc ID#15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • Inventory Appraise Claims -no fee w/in 90 days qualification Doc ID#14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • Notice to Creditors Doc ID#13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2018
  • Attorney's Certificate of Compliance 308.004 Doc ID#12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • 306 Notice Doc ID#11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • Oath Doc ID#10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • Order Admit Will to Probate & Granting Letters Testamentary Doc ID#9: no bond

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • Proof of Death and other Facts Doc ID#8

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 03/07/2018
  • Will - Copy Doc ID#4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2018
  • Application for Probate of Will Doc ID#3: Owes JF, Owes for Letters

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2018
  • Probate Supplemental Case Information Sheet Doc ID#2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2018
  • Civil Case Information Sheet Doc ID#1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • Mail: Receipt # PR-0345075: American Express National Bank (AENB): (10.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • Financial Information: Claimant American Express National Bank (AENB); Total Financial Assessment: 10.00; Total Payments and Credits: 10.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • Counter Payment: Receipt # PR-0343256: Amon, Jason Michael: (12.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • Transaction Assessment: 12.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2018
  • eFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-81423: Sherrod, Colice Kathryn: (256.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2018
  • Financial Information: Applicant Sherrod, Colice Kathryn; Total Financial Assessment: 268.00; Total Payments and Credits: 268.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 256.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where C/O Estate Information Services, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jason Michael Amon