Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 08/03/2021 at 01:28:47 (UTC).

In the Estate of Mark Steven Adams, Deceased

Case Summary

On 03/26/2021 In the Estate of Mark Steven Adams, Deceased was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, Probate Court #1 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Ponder, Christopher W. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********67-1

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Probate Court #1

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Ponder, Christopher W

 

Party Details

Not Classified By Court

Unknown, Missing, or Incapacitated Heir

Decedent

Adams, Mark Steven

Applicant and Administrator

Adams, Jeremy

Fort Worth, TX 76131

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Joanna Baird

Applicant and Administrator Attorney

Cary Schroeder

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketCertified Copy Index # 21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketOath Index # 20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketStatement of Facts Index # 19: Jeremy Adams

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketStatement of Facts Index # 18: Mary Adams

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketProof of Statement of Heirship Facts Index # 17: Cary Adams

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • Docket306 Notice Index # 16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketOrder Appointing Independ Admin and Determining Heirship Index # 15: w/o Bond

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketIndependent Admin with Determination of Heirship Hearing: (2:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Ponder, Christopher W.) : via zoom/Consents on file/202 Atty cert needed-emailed atty.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketCorrespondence Index # 14: Re: Email for Zoom Hearing Link

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketNotice Index # 13: of Change of Firm and Address

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketMiscellaneous Document Index # 6: Commercial Recorder Invoice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketAnswer Attorney Ad Litem Index # 5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketOrder Appointing Attorney Ad Litem Index # 4: 817-842-2312

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketCorrespondence Index # 3: Email to Attorney Requesting Ad Litem Deposit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketCitation - Publication: Return Date 04/12/2021 Also Posted On OCA Website; Unknown, Missing, or Incapacitated Heir: Served: 04/12/2021; Returned: 04/26/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketCitation - Poster: Return Date 04/12/2021; Public Notice: Served: 04/01/2021; Returned: 04/05/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-114992: Adams, Jeremy: (385.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Applicant Adams, Jeremy; Total Financial Assessment: 403.00; Total Payments and Credits: 403.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 385.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketProbate Supplemental Case Information Sheet Index # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketApplication for Indep Admin 401.003 & Determine of Heirship Index # 1: Owes $4 JF and Letters Pd $129 PUB

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Cary Schroeder