Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 06/06/2018 at 08:14:56 (UTC).

In the Estate of Marion C. Brown, Sr., Deceased

Case Summary

On 12/20/2017 In the Estate of Marion C Brown, Sr , Deceased was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, Probate Court #1 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is King, Steve M. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********18-1

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Probate Court #1

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

King, Steve M

 

Party Details

Decedent

Brown, Marion C., SR Also Known As Brown, Marion Columbus, SR

Applicant

Brown, Connie Lee Hamlett Also Known As Brown, Connie

Fort Worth, TX 76119

Not Classified By Court

Unknown, Missing, or Incapacitated Heir

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant Attorney

Brent R. Dore

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/29/2018
  • Certified Copy Doc ID#12: CC Will & Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • Order Admit Will to Probate as Muniment of Title Doc ID#11: Affidavit of Compliance is hereby waived

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • Proof of Death and other Facts Doc ID#10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • Muniment of Title Hearing: (10:45 AM) (Judicial OfficerKing, Steve M.) : Result: Order Signed: Comp aff waived.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • Declination to Serve Doc ID#9: -Waiver of Citation Ronald Kirk Brown

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • Declination to Serve Doc ID#8: -Waiver of Citation Maria Denise Brown Monk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • Hearing Setting Letter Doc ID#7: Hearing 1-29-18 @10:45 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Correspondence Doc ID#6: Re: to Original Will

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Will - Original Doc ID#5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Citation - Poster: Ret. Date 01/01/2017; Public Notice: Served: 12/21/2017; Returned: 12/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Probate Supplemental Case Information Sheet Doc ID#4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Civil Case Information Sheet Doc ID#3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Will - Copy Doc ID#2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Application for Muniment of Title Doc ID#1: Pd $2.00 JFs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • Counter Payment: Receipt # PR-0341639: Dore, Brent R.: (14.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • Financial Information: Attorney Dore, Brent R.; Total Financial Assessment: 14.00; Total Payments and Credits: 14.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 14.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • eFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-79659: Brown, Connie: (258.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Financial Information: Applicant Brown, Connie Lee Hamlett; Total Financial Assessment: 258.00; Total Payments and Credits: 258.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 258.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brent R. Dore