Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 08/01/2018 at 07:18:11 (UTC).

In the Estate of Maria Rivera Garza, Deceased

Case Summary

On 12/20/2017 In the Estate of Maria Rivera Garza, Deceased was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, Probate Court #2 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Allen, Brooke U. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********28-2

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Probate Court #2

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Allen, Brooke U

 

Party Details

Applicant and Executor

Cole, Diana Rebeca Farias Also Known As Cole, Diana Rebecca Farias

Groves, TX 77619

Decedent

Garza, Maria Rivera

Not Classified By Court

Unknown, Missing, or Incapacitated Heir

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant and Executor Attorney

Karen Hutchinson Gordon

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/02/2018
  • 306 Notice Doc ID#16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • Order Approving Inventory, Appraisment & List of Claims Doc ID#15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • Inventory Appraise Claims -no fee w/in 90 days qualification Doc ID#14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2018
  • Notice to Creditors Doc ID#13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • Attorney's Certificate of Compliance 308.004 Doc ID#12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2018
  • Oath Doc ID#11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • 306 Notice Doc ID#10: Order Admitting Will

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • Order Admit Will to Probate & Granting Letters Testamentary Doc ID#9: Appt'd IEXR w/o bond

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • Proof of Death and other Facts Doc ID#8: Allyson Duncan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • Probate Of Will Hearing: (9:45 AM) (Judicial OfficerAllen, Brooke U.) : Result: Order Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 12/27/2017
  • Will - Original Doc ID#5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • Citation - Poster: Return Date: 01/01/2018; Public Notice: Served: 12/21/2017; Returned: 12/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Civil Case Information Sheet Doc ID#4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Probate Supplemental Case Information Sheet Doc ID#3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Will - Copy Doc ID#2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Application for Probate of Will Doc ID#1: Paid $4 JF, Paid $8 for Letters

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • eFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-79956: Cole, Diana Rebeca Farias: (3.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • Transaction Assessment: 3.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • eFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-79674: Cole, Rebecca: (268.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • Financial Information: Applicant Cole, Diana Rebeca Farias; Total Financial Assessment: 271.00; Total Payments and Credits: 271.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 268.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Karen H. Gordon