Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 02/04/2019 at 10:22:45 (UTC).

In the Estate of Maria Concepcion Padilla, Deceased

Case Summary

On 12/14/2017 In the Estate of Maria Concepcion Padilla, Deceased was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, Probate Court #2 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Kelly, Lynn. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********72-2

  • Filing Date:

    12/14/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Probate Court #2

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Kelly, Lynn

 

Party Details

Decedents

Padilla, Maria Concepcion

Padilla, Maria Concepcion Also Known As Padilla, Maria Concepcion Garcia de

Applicant

Padilla, Gabriela E.

Fort Worth, TX 76016

Not Classified By Court

Unknown, Missing, or Incapacitated Heir

Interested Parties

Padilla, James A.

Fort Worth, TX 76137

Padilla, Samuel S.

Fort Worth, TX 76106

Padilla, Juanita H.

Fort Worth, TX 76106

Padilla, Alberto A.

Fort Worth, TX 76106

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant Attorney

Margaret Jensen Crosby

Interested Party Attorney

David C. Bakutis

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/19/2018
  • Answer/Response Doc ID#13: and General Denial to Application to Probate Will

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • Notice of Appearance by Attorney Doc ID#12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • Citation - Poster: Public Notice: Served: 08/08/2018; Returned: 08/09/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • Application for Muniment of Title Doc ID#11: First Amended Application For Probate of Holographic Will as Muniment of Title and Request for Declaratory Relief to Determine Takers of the Residuary Estate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2018
  • CANCELED: Independent Adminstration With Will Annexed Hearing; (10:30 AM) (Judicial OfficerKelly, Lynn) ; Per Attorney; (CROSBY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2018
  • Hearing Setting Letter Doc ID#10: June 19, 2018 @ 10:30

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • Citation - Personal: Alberto Padilla; Padilla, Alberto A.: Served: 03/19/2018; Returned: 03/21/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • Citation - Personal: James Padilla; Padilla, James A.: Served: 03/12/2018; Returned: 03/14/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • Citation - Personal: Juanita Padilla; Padilla, Juanita H.: Served: 03/21/2018; Returned: 03/23/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • Citation - Personal: Samuel Padilla; Padilla, Samuel S.: Served: 03/21/2018; Returned: 03/23/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 12/14/2017
  • Affidavit Doc ID#4: Certification of Translation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • Will - Copy Doc ID#3: Certified Translated Copy

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • Will - Copy Doc ID#2: Holographic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • Application for Indep Admin with Will Annex 401.002b Doc ID#1: and Request for Declaratory Relief to Determine Takers of the Residuary Estate Owes $2 JF, Pd $2 JF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • eFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-85318: Padilla, Gabriela E.: (24.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • Transaction Assessment: 24.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2018
  • eFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-81442: Padilla, Gabriela E.: (344.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2018
  • Transaction Assessment: 344.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2017
  • eFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-79538: Padilla, Gabriela E.: (258.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2017
  • Financial Information: Applicant Padilla, Gabriela E.; Total Financial Assessment: 626.00; Total Payments and Credits: 626.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 258.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer David C. Bakutis