This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 06/27/2022 at 07:30:24 (UTC).

In the Estate of Luther Randle Moore, SR, Deceased

Case Summary

On 02/08/2022 In the Estate of Luther Randle Moore, SR, Deceased was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, Probate Court #1 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Ponder, Christopher W. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********47-1

  • Filing Date:

    02/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Ponder, Christopher W

 

Party Details

Executor and Applicant

Moore, Emma Jean

Lake Worth, TX 76135

Decedent

Moore, Luther Randle, SR Also Known As Moore, Luther R., SR

Lake Worth, TX 76135

Not Classified By Court

Unknown, Missing, or Incapacitated Heir

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Executor and Applicant Attorney

Creighton Maynard

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/23/2022
  • Docket306 Notice Index # 19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • DocketOrder Approving Inventory, Appraisment & List of Claims Index # 18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • DocketNotice Index # 17: to Unsecured Creditor with CMRRR receipt (Home Depot)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • DocketInventory Appraise Claims -no fee w/in 90 days qualification Index # 16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • DocketAttorney's Certificate of Compliance 308.004 Index # 15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • DocketNotice to Creditors Index # 14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-132129: Moore, Emma Jean: (6.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • FinancialTransaction Assessment: 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • DocketRequest Index # 13: Email copy of Oath, Proof of Death and Order to attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • Docket306 Notice Index # 12

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 03/22/2022
  • DocketWaiver of Citation/Service Index # 6: Waiver of Notice of Admission of Will Emma Jean Moore

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • DocketWaiver of Citation/Service Index # 5: Waiver of Notice of Admission of Will Luther R. Moore, Jr.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • DocketWill - Original Index # 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • FinancialState Credit: (137.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-128554: Moore, Emma Jean: (263.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Applicant Moore, Emma Jean; Total Financial Assessment: 408.00; Total Payments and Credits: 408.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • DocketCitation - Poster: Return Date 02/21/2022; Public Notice: Served: 02/10/2022; Returned: 02/14/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • DocketProbate Supplemental Case Information Sheet Index # 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • DocketWill - Copy Index # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • DocketApplication for Probate of Will Index # 1: Pd $4 JF, Pd $8 Letters

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Creighton Maynard