Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 07/23/2018 at 06:11:57 (UTC).

In the Estate of Lorraine Irene Turner, Deceased

Case Summary

On 12/19/2017 In the Estate of Lorraine Irene Turner, Deceased was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, Probate Court #2 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Allen, Brooke U. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********08-2

  • Filing Date:

    12/19/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Probate Court #2

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Allen, Brooke U

 

Party Details

Decedent

Turner, Lorraine Irene

Fort Worth, TX 76137

Not Classified By Court

Unknown, Missing, or Incapacitated Heir

Applicant

Turner, Paul Eric

Fort Worth, TX 76244

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant Attorney

Jocelyn L. Irby

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/29/2018
  • Certified Copy Doc ID#11: CC Will & Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • Proof of Handwriting & Signature Doc ID#10: Kellie Ward

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • Proof of Handwriting & Signature Doc ID#9: Kerrie Turner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • Order Admit Will to Probate as Muniment of Title Doc ID#8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • Proof of Death and other Facts Doc ID#7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • Muniment of Title Hearing: (10:00 AM) (Judicial OfficerAllen, Brooke U.) : Result: Order Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Waiver of Citation/Service Doc ID#6: and Declination to Serve - Kerrie Turner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Will - Original Doc ID#5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Citation - Poster: Return Date: 01/01/2018; Public Notice: Served: 12/21/2017; Returned: 12/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • Probate Supplemental Case Information Sheet Doc ID#4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • Civil Case Information Sheet Doc ID#3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • Will - Copy Doc ID#2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • Application for Muniment of Title Doc ID#1: Paid $2 JF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • Counter Payment: Receipt # PR-0341629: Irby, Jocelyn L.: (14.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • Transaction Assessment: 14.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • Financial Information: Attorney Irby, Jocelyn L.; Total Financial Assessment: 16.00; Total Payments and Credits: 14.00; Balance Due: 2.00. Transaction Assessment: 2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • eFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-79634: Turner, Paul Eric: (258.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Financial Information: Applicant Turner, Paul Eric; Total Financial Assessment: 258.00; Total Payments and Credits: 258.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 258.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jocelyn L. Irby