Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 04/24/2021 at 06:15:32 (UTC).

In the Estate of Lorraine Balchunas Grossi, Deceased

Case Summary

On 03/01/2021 In the Estate of Lorraine Balchunas Grossi, Deceased was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, Probate Court #1 located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********61-1

  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Probate Court #1

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Applicants

Grossi, Silvia

Waxahachie, TX 75165

Winborne LaFleur PC

Waxahachie, TX 75165

Decedent

Grossi, Lorraine Balchunas

Grapevine, TX 76051

Not Classified By Court

Unknown, Missing, or Incapacitated Heir

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant Attorney

Joseph E. LaFleur

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketAmended Appl for Indep Admin & To Determine Heirship Index #6: First

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketMotion Index #5: to Appoint Ad Litem

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketMiscellaneous Document Index #4: Commercial Recorder Invoice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-113698: Grossi, Silvia: (385.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Applicant Grossi, Silvia; Total Financial Assessment: 385.00; Total Payments and Credits: 385.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 385.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketCitation - Publication: Return Date 3/15/21 - Posted to OCA Website; Unknown, Missing, or Incapacitated Heir: Served: 03/11/2021; Returned: 03/15/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketCitation - Poster: Return Date 3/15/21; Public Notice: Served: 03/04/2021; Returned: 03/05/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketProbate Supplemental Case Information Sheet Index #3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketMiscellaneous Document Index #2: Death Certificate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketApplication for Indep Admin 401.003 & Determine of Heirship Index #1: Owes $4 JF & Ltrs, Paid $129 Pub Fee

    Read MoreRead Less