Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 02/05/2021 at 11:03:33 (UTC).

In the Estate of Lloyd F. Day, Deceased

Case Summary

On 10/13/2020 In the Estate of Lloyd F Day, Deceased was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, Probate Court #1 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Ponder, Christopher W. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********71-1

  • Filing Date:

    10/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Probate Court #1

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Ponder, Christopher W

 

Party Details

Applicant

Day, Barbara B.

Fort Worth, TX 76102

Not Classified By Court

Unknown, Missing, or Incapacitated Heir

Decedent

Day, Lloyd F.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant Attorney

David C. Bakutis

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketProof of Death and other Facts Index #5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketMuniment of Title Hearing: (3:30 PM) (Judicial OfficerPonder, Christopher W.) : via zoom

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketHearing Setting Letter Index #4: 01/07/2021 at 3:30 pm

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-108556: Day, Barbara: (256.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Applicant Day, Barbara B.; Total Financial Assessment: 256.00; Total Payments and Credits: 256.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 256.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketCitation - Poster: Return Date 10/26/20; Public Notice: Served: 10/15/2020; Returned: 10/16/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketWill - Original Index #3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketWill - Copy Index #2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketApplication for Muniment of Title Index #1: Owes $2 JF

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer David C. Bakutis