This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 09/21/2022 at 11:08:18 (UTC).

In the Estate of Linda Fay Gross, Deceased

Case Summary

On 03/07/2022 In the Estate of Linda Fay Gross, Deceased was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, Tarrant County Probate Court #1 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Ponder, Christopher W. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********22-1

  • Filing Date:

    03/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Ponder, Christopher W

 

Party Details

Executor

Marcus, Jarod Also Known As Marcus, Jarod Elton

Keller, TX 76248

Decedent

Gross, Linda Fay Also Known As Marcus, Linda Fay

North Richland Hills, TX 76180

Not Classified By Court

Unknown, Missing, or Incapacitated Heir

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant and Executor Attorney

Brooks P. Lynn

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/22/2022
  • Docket306 Notice Index # 14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketOrder Approving Inventory, Appraisment & List of Claims Index # 13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketAttorney's Certificate of Compliance 308.004 Index # 12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketInventory Appraise Claims -no fee w/in 90 days qualification Index # 11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • DocketNotice to Creditors Index # 10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • FinancialCounter Payment: Receipt # PR-0368300: Lynn, Brooks P.: (7.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • FinancialTransaction Assessment: 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • Docket306 Notice Index # 9

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • DocketOath Index # 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • DocketOrder Admit Will to Probate & Granting Letters Testamentary Index # 7: without bond

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 04/18/2022
  • FinancialTransaction Assessment: 2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • DocketHearing Setting Letter Index # 5: April 21, 2022 @ 10 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • DocketWill - Original Index # 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • FinancialState Credit: (137.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-129865: Marcus, Jarod Elton: (263.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Applicant Marcus, Jarod; Total Financial Assessment: 409.00; Total Payments and Credits: 409.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • DocketCitation - Poster: Return Date 03/21/2022; Public Notice: Served: 03/10/2022; Returned: 03/11/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • DocketProbate Supplemental Case Information Sheet Index # 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • DocketWill - Copy Index # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • DocketApplication for Probate of Will Index # 1: Pd $4 JF, Pd $8 Letters

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brooks P. Lynn