Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 04/11/2021 at 06:10:19 (UTC).

In the Estate of Leo Santos Vargas, Deceased

Case Summary

On 03/03/2021 In the Estate of Leo Santos Vargas, Deceased was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, Probate Court #2 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Allen, Brooke U. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********01-2

  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Probate Court #2

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Allen, Brooke U

 

Party Details

Decedent

Vargas, Leo Santos Also Known As Vargas, Leo S.

Not Classified By Court

Unknown, Missing, or Incapacitated Heir

Applicant

Inabinet, Norma L. Also Known As Inabinet, Norma Lopez

Garden Ridge, TX 78266

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant Attorney

Andrew F Stasio, JR

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketProbate Of Will Hearing: (10:20 AM) (Judicial OfficerAllen, Brooke U.) : Email andrew.stasio@stasiolawfirm.com

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketHearing Setting Letter Index #6: May 24th, 2021 at 10:20am via Zoom

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketWill - Original Index #5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-113806: Inabinet, Norma L.: (268.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Applicant Inabinet, Norma L.; Total Financial Assessment: 268.00; Total Payments and Credits: 268.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 268.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketCitation - Poster: Return Date 03/15/2021; Public Notice: Served: 03/04/2021; Returned: 03/05/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketProbate Supplemental Case Information Sheet Index #4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Information Sheet Index #3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketWill - Copy Index #2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketApplication for Probate of Will Index #1: Pd $4 JF, Pd $8 Letters

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrew F Stasio, JR