Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 05/02/2021 at 11:53:47 (UTC).

In The Estate of Lena Mae Vardiman, Deceased

Case Summary

On 10/14/2020 In The Estate of Lena Mae Vardiman, Deceased was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, Probate Court #1 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Ponder, Christopher W. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********85-1

  • Filing Date:

    10/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Probate Court #1

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Ponder, Christopher W

 

Party Details

Claimants

Texas Health Resources

7601 Penn Avenue, So., Ste. A-600

Minneapolis, MN 55423-9923

C/O DCM Services, LLC

7601 Penn Avenue, So., Ste. A-600

Minneapolis, MN 55423-9923

Not Classified By Court

Unknown, Missing, or Incapacitated Heir

Applicant

Vardiman, John Colin, SR

Fruitland Park, FL 34731

Decedent

Vardiman, Lena Mae

Interested Parties

Vardiman, Jeffrey Vincent

Arlington, TX 76103

Vardiman, Anthony Duane

San Antonio, TX 78253

Vardiman, John C., JR

Tyler, TX 75702

Vardiman, Kevin Bradford

Indianapolis, IN 46201

Ervin, Leann Renee Vardiman

Grand Prairie, TX 75052

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Antoinette Bone

Applicant Attorney

John C. Arneson

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketDetermination of Heirship Hearing: (3:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Ponder, Christopher W.) : via zoom

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketCommission to Take Deposition Index # 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-115899: Vardiman, John Colin: (40.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • FinancialTransaction Assessment: 40.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketCitation - Poster: Ret Date 05/03/21; Public Notice: Served: 04/19/2021; Returned: 04/20/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketNotice of Intention to take Deposition on Written Questions Index # 25: Pd Poster, CC and $11 NCC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketDeposition - Information Filing Form Index # 24

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketInterrogatories Index # 23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketCorrespondence Index # 22: Filing LEtter to Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-115650: Vardiman, John Colin: (40.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
42 More Docket Entries
  • 10/19/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Decedent Vardiman, Lena Mae; Total Financial Assessment: 83.00; Total Payments and Credits: 83.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 83.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketCorrespondence Index # 3: Email to Attorney Requesting Ad Litem Deposit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketCitation - Publication: Return Date 10/26/20 added to OCA website; Unknown, Missing, or Incapacitated Heir: Served: 11/17/2020; Returned: 11/17/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketCitation - Poster: Return Date 10/26/20; Public Notice: Served: 10/15/2020; Returned: 10/16/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-108600: Vardiman, John: (24.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • FinancialTransaction Assessment: 24.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-108599: Vardiman, John: (361.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Applicant Vardiman, John Colin, SR; Total Financial Assessment: 705.00; Total Payments and Credits: 705.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 361.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketRequest Index # 2: for Poster Citation - Paid $24 Poster

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketApplication for Determination of Heirship Index # 1: Owes $2 JF, Paid $129 Publication

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Texas Health Resources is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John C. Arneson