This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 09/01/2018 at 08:50:21 (UTC).

In the Estate of Leland Eugene Campbell, Deceased

Case Summary

On 03/12/2018 In the Estate of Leland Eugene Campbell, Deceased was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, Probate Court #2 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Kelly, Lynn. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********31-2

  • Filing Date:

    03/12/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Kelly, Lynn

 

Party Details

Not Classified By Court

Unknown, Missing, or Incapacitated Heir

Applicant and Executor

Campbell, William Lee

Arlington, TX 76017

Decedent

Campbell, Leland Eugene Also Known As Campbell, Gene

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant and Executor Attorney

William L Campbell

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/03/2018
  • Order Extending Time to File Inventory & Appraisement Doc ID#16: Extended to December 28, 2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2018
  • Application for Extension of Time to File Inventory & App. Doc ID#15: December 28, 2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • Notice to Creditors Doc ID#14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • Affidavit of 308 Notice Doc ID#13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • 306 Notice Doc ID#10: Order Probating Will

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • Oath Doc ID#9

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • Order Admit Will to Probate & Granting Letters Testamentary Doc ID#8: w/o bond

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • Proof of Death and other Facts Doc ID#7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • Probate Of Will Hearing: (11:00 AM) (Judicial OfficerKelly, Lynn) : Result: Order Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • Waiver of 308 Doc ID#12: Anne Settle

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • Waiver of 308 Doc ID#11: Michael Campbell

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • Hearing Setting Letter Doc ID#6: March 28, 2018 @ 11:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • Citation - Poster: Ret. Date 03/26/2018; Public Notice: Served: 03/15/2018; Returned: 03/16/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • Probate Supplemental Case Information Sheet Doc ID#5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • Civil Case Information Sheet Doc ID#4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • Will - Original Doc ID#3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • Will - Copy Doc ID#2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • Application for Probate of Will Doc ID#1: Pd $4.00 JFs, Pd $8.00 for Letters

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • eFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-81560: CAMPBELL, WILLIAM LEE: (268.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • Financial Information: Applicant Campbell, William Lee; Total Financial Assessment: 268.00; Total Payments and Credits: 268.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 268.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer William L. Campbell