Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 02/14/2021 at 14:41:18 (UTC).

In the Estate of Lane Robert Williams, Deceased

Case Summary

On 07/20/2020 In the Estate of Lane Robert Williams, Deceased was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, Probate Court #2 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Allen, Brooke U. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********64-2

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Probate Court #2

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Allen, Brooke U

 

Party Details

Not Classified By Court

Unknown, Missing, or Incapacitated Heir

Decedent

Williams, Lane Robert

Euless, TX 76039

Applicant and Executor

Logsdon, Ashlee Also Known As Logsdon, Ashlee Dawn Also Known As Logsdon, Ashlee Williams

Aledo, TX 76008

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant and Executor Attorney

John C. Arneson

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketAttorney's Certificate of Compliance 308.004 Index #17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • Docket306 Notice Index #16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketOrder Approving Inventory, Appraisment & List of Claims Index #15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketNotice to Creditors Index #14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-107943: Logsdon, Ashlee: (2.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • FinancialTransaction Assessment: 2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketInventory Appraise Claims -no fee w/in 90 days qualification Index #13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • FinancialCounter Payment: Receipt # PR-0359618: Arneson, John C.: (22.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Attorney Arneson, John C.; Total Financial Assessment: 22.00; Total Payments and Credits: 22.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 22.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-107147: Logsdon, Ashlee: (2.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 08/21/2020
  • DocketProof of Death and other Facts Index #6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-105688: Logsdon, Ashlee: (4.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • FinancialTransaction Assessment: 4.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • DocketHearing Setting Letter Index #5: September 3 , 2020 @ 1:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • DocketWill - Original Index #4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-105192: Logsdon, Ashlee: (256.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Applicant Logsdon, Ashlee; Total Financial Assessment: 266.00; Total Payments and Credits: 266.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 256.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • DocketCitation - Poster: Return Date 8/3/20; Public Notice: Served: 07/23/2020; Returned: 07/24/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • DocketProbate Supplemental Case Information Sheet Index #2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • DocketApplication for Probate of Will Index #1: with Attached Will - Owes $4 JF & Ltrs

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer John C. Arneson