Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 04/27/2021 at 06:08:42 (UTC).

In the Estate of Kenneth Weldon Koenig, Deceased

Case Summary

On 03/26/2021 In the Estate of Kenneth Weldon Koenig, Deceased was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, Probate Court #1 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Ponder, Christopher W. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********71-1

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Probate Court #1

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Ponder, Christopher W

 

Party Details

Applicant

Koenig, Steven Wayne

Fairfax, VA 22032

Not Classified By Court

Unknown, Missing, or Incapacitated Heir

Decedent

Koenig, Kenneth Weldon

Fort Worth, TX 76120

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant and Decedent Attorney

Jocelyn L. Irby

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketMuniment of Title Hearing: (9:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Ponder, Christopher W.) : via zoom

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-116185: Koenig, Steven Wayne: (2.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • FinancialTransaction Assessment: 2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketHearing Setting Letter Index # 5: 5/6/2021 9:30

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-115000: Koenig, Steven Wayne: (256.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Applicant Koenig, Steven Wayne; Total Financial Assessment: 258.00; Total Payments and Credits: 258.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 256.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketWill - Original Index # 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketCitation - Poster: Return Date 4/12/21; Public Notice: Served: 03/31/2021; Returned: 04/01/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketProbate Supplemental Case Information Sheet Index # 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketWill - Copy Index # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketApplication for Muniment of Title Index # 1: Owes $2 JF

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jocelyn L. Irby