Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 05/12/2021 at 21:38:29 (UTC).

In the Estate of Kenneth Hillary Willy, Deceased

Case Summary

On 12/15/2020 In the Estate of Kenneth Hillary Willy, Deceased was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, Probate Court #2 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judges overseeing this case are Kelly, Lynn and Allen, Brooke U. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********05-2

  • Filing Date:

    12/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Probate Court #2

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judges

Kelly, Lynn

Allen, Brooke U

 

Party Details

Decedent

Willy, Kenneth Hillary

Not Classified By Court

Unknown, Missing, or Incapacitated Heir

Applicant

Wynn, Karen Also Known As Wynn, Karen Shiela

Fort Worth, TX 76116

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant Attorney

Bruce L. Mansfield

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/09/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-114078: Wynn, Karen: (2.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • FinancialTransaction Assessment: 2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • Docket306 Notice Index # 12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketOrder Admit Will to Probate as Muniment of Title Index # 11: Compliance Affidavit Waived

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketProof of Death and other Facts Index # 10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketOath Index # 9: of No Debts

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketMuniment of Title Hearing: (3:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Allen, Brooke U.) : Email bruce@mansfieldpc.com

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-113663: Wynn, Karen: (2.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • FinancialTransaction Assessment: 2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • DocketCANCELED: Muniment of Title Hearing; (9:45 AM) (Judicial Officer Kelly, Lynn) ; Per Attorney; mark@mansfieldpc.com

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketHearing Setting Letter Index # 7: February 12, 2021 at 9:45 a.m. via Zoom

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketCorrespondence Index # 6: Re Ken Willy

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketMiscellaneous Document Index # 5: Death Certificate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketWill - Original Index # 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-110872: Wynn, Karen: (256.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Applicant Wynn, Karen; Total Financial Assessment: 260.00; Total Payments and Credits: 260.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 256.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketCitation - Poster: Return Date 12/28/20; Public Notice: Served: 12/17/2020; Returned: 12/18/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketProbate Supplemental Case Information Sheet Index # 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketWill - Copy Index # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketApplication for Muniment of Title Index # 1: Owes $2 JF

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bruce L. Mansfield