Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 05/03/2021 at 06:35:43 (UTC).

In the Estate of Karen Jane Hughes, Deceased

Case Summary

On 03/01/2021 In the Estate of Karen Jane Hughes, Deceased was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, Probate Court #1 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is McGown, Quentin. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********57-1

  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Probate Court #1

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

McGown, Quentin

 

Party Details

Not Classified By Court

Unknown, Missing, or Incapacitated Heir

Decedent

Hughes, Karen Jane Also Known As Hughes, Karen Jane Stoebner

Applicant

Hughes, Kevin Bruce

Waxahachie, TX 75152

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant Attorney

Paul M. Buchanan

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketMuniment of Title Hearing: (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer McGown, Quentin) : via zoom

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketWaiver Index # 6: and Renunciation of Right of Appointment to Letters Testamentary - Harold Hughes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketApplication for Muniment of Title Index # 5: First Amended

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • FinancialCounter Payment: Receipt # PR-0361988: Hughes, Kevin Bruce: (256.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Applicant Hughes, Kevin Bruce; Total Financial Assessment: 256.00; Total Payments and Credits: 256.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 256.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketCitation - Poster: Return Date 3/15/21; Public Notice: Served: 03/04/2021; Returned: 03/05/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketProbate Supplemental Case Information Sheet Index # 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Information Sheet Index # 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketWill - Original Index # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketApplication for Muniment of Title Index # 1: Owes $2 JF

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Paul M. Buchanan