Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 02/05/2021 at 02:08:45 (UTC).

In the Estate of Julie Hun Kim, Deceased

Case Summary

On 08/20/2020 In the Estate of Julie Hun Kim, Deceased was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, Probate Court #1 located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********01-1

  • Filing Date:

    08/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Probate Court #1

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Not Classified By Court

Unknown, Missing, or Incapacitated Heir

Applicant

Lee, Yu Min Also Known As Lee, Yu

Lake Dallas, TX 76065

Decedent

Kim, Julie Hun Also Known As Kim, Juli Hun

Fort Worth, TX 76116

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant Attorney

Bruce L. Mansfield

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/21/2020
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-106438: Lee, Yu Min: (256.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Applicant Lee, Yu Min; Total Financial Assessment: 256.00; Total Payments and Credits: 256.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 256.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • DocketWaiver Index #4: and Renunciation of Right to Letters Testamentary Wang Hun Kim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • DocketCitation - Poster: Return Date 09-07-20; Public Notice: Served: 08/24/2020; Returned: 08/25/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketProbate Supplemental Case Information Sheet Index #3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketWill - Copy Index #2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketApplication for Muniment of Title Index #1: Owes $2 JF

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bruce L. Mansfield