Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 04/27/2021 at 06:14:18 (UTC).

In the Estate of Juanita Joy Hurtt, Deceased

Case Summary

On 01/25/2021 In the Estate of Juanita Joy Hurtt, Deceased was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, Probate Court #2 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Kelly, Lynn. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********75-2

  • Filing Date:

    01/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Probate Court #2

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Kelly, Lynn

 

Party Details

Applicant and Executor

Hurtt, Larry Don

Austin, TX 78727

Not Classified By Court

Unknown, Missing, or Incapacitated Heir

Decedent

Hurtt, Juanita Joy Also Known As Hurtt, Juanita

Azle, TX 76020

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant and Executor Attorney

Tyler A. Harden

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketAssoc. Judge Order Approved by Presiding Judge

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketProof Index # 14: of Decedent's Handwriting for Pamela Brown

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketProof of Death and other Facts Index # 13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketOath Index # 12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketProof Index # 11: of Decedent's Handwriting and Signature for Larry Hurtt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • Docket306 Notice Index # 10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketOrder Admit Will to Probate & Granting Letters Testamentary Index # 9: Without Bond

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketProbate Of Will Hearing: (2:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Kelly, Lynn) : HOLOGRAPHIC WILL tyler@tylerhardenlaw.com

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketHearing Setting Letter Index # 8: Wednesday, April 14, 2021 @ 2:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketConsent to Appointment Index # 7: and Waiver of Citation-Tony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketConsent to Appointment Index # 6: and Waiver of Citation-Cindy

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketConsent to Appointment Index # 5: and Waiver of Citation-Crystal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketWill - Original Index # 4: Holographic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-112268: Hurtt, Larry Don: (270.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Applicant Hurtt, Larry Don; Total Financial Assessment: 270.00; Total Payments and Credits: 270.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 270.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketCitation - Poster: Return Date 02/08/2021; Public Notice: Served: 01/28/2021; Returned: 01/29/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketWill - Copy Index # 3: Holographic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketProbate Supplemental Case Information Sheet Index # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketApplication for Probate of Will Index # 1: Pd $4 JF, Pd $10 Letters

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Tyler A. Harden