Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 05/23/2018 at 22:31:32 (UTC).

In the Estate of Josephine Galvan Luna, Deceased

Case Summary

On 12/19/2017 In the Estate of Josephine Galvan Luna, Deceased was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, Probate Court #2 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Allen, Brooke U. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********14-2

  • Filing Date:

    12/19/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Probate Court #2

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Allen, Brooke U

 

Party Details

Not Classified By Court

Unknown, Missing, or Incapacitated Heir

Decedent

Luna, Josephine Galvan

Applicant

Luna, Linda

Fort Worth, TX 76116

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Olga Horwath Campbell

Applicant Attorney

Thomas F. Dunn

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/23/2018
  • 306 Notice Doc ID#15: Judgement Determining Heirship

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • Certified Copy Doc ID#14: 2 CC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • Order for Payment of Appointee Fees Doc ID#13: $400 to be paid from Registry of Court; Appt is termianted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • Judgment Determining Heirship Doc ID#12: as set out in court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • Proof of Statement of Heirship Facts Doc ID#11: Richard Istre

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • Proof of Statement of Heirship Facts Doc ID#10: Carol Butler

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • Proof of Death and other Facts Doc ID#9

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • Determination of Heirship Hearing: (2:00 PM) (Judicial OfficerAllen, Brooke U.) : Result: Order Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • Hearing Setting Letter Doc ID#8: Letter Confirming hearing set for January 23, 2018 @2:00 pm

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • Report of Attorney Ad Litem Doc ID#7: w/attached Exhibit "A"

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 12/20/2017
  • Correspondence Doc ID#4: Clerks Email Request for AAL Fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • Probate Supplemental Case Information Sheet Doc ID#3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • Civil Case Information Sheet Doc ID#2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • Application for Determination of Heirship Doc ID#1: Owes $2 JF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • Counter Payment: Receipt # PR-0341573: Dunn, Thomas F.: (14.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • Financial Information: Attorney Dunn, Thomas F.; Total Financial Assessment: 14.00; Total Payments and Credits: 14.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 14.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • eFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-80077: Luna, Linda: (2.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Transaction Assessment: 2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • eFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-79648: luna, linda: (385.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Financial Information: Applicant Luna, Linda; Total Financial Assessment: 387.00; Total Payments and Credits: 387.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 385.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Thomas F. Dunn