Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 05/10/2021 at 06:21:13 (UTC).

In the Estate of Joseph Scott Woolard, Deceased

Case Summary

On 02/24/2021 In the Estate of Joseph Scott Woolard, Deceased was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, Probate Court #1 located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********85-1

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Probate Court #1

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Decedent

Woolard, Joseph Scott

Not Classified By Court

Unknown, Missing, or Incapacitated Heir

Applicant

Woolard, Blake

Kailua, HI 96734

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court Attorney

George H. Golightly

Applicant Attorney

David C. Bakutis

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketMiscellaneous Document Index # 7: Commercial Recorder Invoice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketAppt of Resident Agent Index # 6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketOrder Appointing Attorney Ad Litem Index # 5: 817-263-5190

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-113504: Woolard, Blake: (8.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • FinancialTransaction Assessment: 8.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketCitation - Publication: Return Date 03/08/2021 Also Posted on OCA Website; Unknown, Missing, or Incapacitated Heir: Served: 03/02/2021; Returned: 03/12/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketCitation - Poster: Return Date 03/08/2021; Public Notice: Served: 02/25/2021; Returned: 02/26/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketCorrespondence Index # 2: Clerk's E-mail to Attorney requesting Attorney Ad Litem Fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-113444: Woolard, Blake: (385.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Applicant Woolard, Blake; Total Financial Assessment: 393.00; Total Payments and Credits: 393.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 385.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketProbate Supplemental Case Information Sheet Index # 4: Pd $8 Ltrs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Information Sheet Index # 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketApplication for Indep Admin 401.003 & Determine of Heirship Index # 1: Owes $4 JF and Letters, Pd $129 Pub

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer David C. Bakutis