Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 04/16/2021 at 06:14:28 (UTC).

In the Estate of Joseph Charles Critz, Deceased

Case Summary

On 03/01/2021 In the Estate of Joseph Charles Critz, Deceased was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, Probate Court #1 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Ponder, Christopher W. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********65-1

  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Probate Court #1

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Ponder, Christopher W

 

Party Details

Claimants

C/O Phillips & Cohen Associates

1002 Justison Street

Wilmington, DE 19801

Carnival MasterCard

Wilmington, DE 19801

Not Classified By Court

Unknown, Missing, or Incapacitated Heir

Decedent

Critz, Joseph Charles

Applicant

Critz, Roger Allen

Westworth Village, TX 76114

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant Attorney

Michael S. Newman

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketIndependent Adminstration With Will Annexed Hearing: (3:00 PM) (Judicial OfficerPonder, Christopher W.) : via zoom

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-115084: Carnival MasterCard: (10.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Claimant Carnival MasterCard; Total Financial Assessment: 10.00; Total Payments and Credits: 10.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketMiscellaneous Document Index #9: Proof of Eservice of Notice Letter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketNotice of Claim Index #8: $5,067.01 - Eserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketClaim Index #7: $5,067.01

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketHearing Setting Letter Index #6: May 11th, 2021 at 03:00pm via Zoom

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketWill - Original Index #5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-113714: Critz, Roger Allen: (268.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Applicant Critz, Roger Allen; Total Financial Assessment: 268.00; Total Payments and Credits: 268.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 268.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketCitation - Poster: Return Date 3/25/21; Public Notice: Served: 03/04/2021; Returned: 03/05/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketProbate Supplemental Case Information Sheet Index #4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketWaiver of Citation/Service Index #3: Roger Critz

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketWill - Copy Index #2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketApplication for Indep Admin with Will Annex 401.002b Index #1: Owes $4 JF, Paid $12 Ltrs

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where C/O Phillips & Cohen Associates is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael S. Newman