This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 03/27/2021 at 06:08:43 (UTC).

In the Estate of John William McCormick, JR, Deceased

Case Summary

On 03/03/2021 In the Estate of John William McCormick, JR, Deceased was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, Probate Court #2 located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********03-2

  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Probate Court #2

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Decedent

McCormick, John William, JR

Arlington, TX 76001

Not Classified By Court

Unknown, Missing, or Incapacitated Heir

Applicant

McCormick, Cherry Lynn

Arlington, TX 76001

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant Attorney

Michael J. Remme

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketConsent to Appointment Index #5: and Waiver of Notice Jessica Lynn McCormick

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketWill - Original Index #4: Holographic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-113816: McCormick, Cherry Lynn: (268.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Applicant McCormick, Cherry Lynn; Total Financial Assessment: 268.00; Total Payments and Credits: 268.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 268.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketCitation - Poster: Return Date 03/15/2021; Public Notice: Served: 03/04/2021; Returned: 03/05/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketProbate Supplemental Case Information Sheet Index #3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketWill - Copy Index #2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketApplication for Indep Admin with Will Annex 401.002b Index #1: Pd $4 JF, Pd $8 Letters

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael J. Remme