Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 04/17/2021 at 06:16:52 (UTC).

In the Estate of John M. Howard, Deceased

Case Summary

On 03/01/2021 In the Estate of John M Howard, Deceased was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, Probate Court #2 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Allen, Brooke U. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********44-2

  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Probate Court #2

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Allen, Brooke U

 

Party Details

Applicant

Howard, Elizabeth T.

Fort Worth, TX 76132

Not Classified By Court

Unknown, Missing, or Incapacitated Heir

Decedent

Howard, John M.

Fort Worth, TX 76132

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant Attorney

MICHAEL D BLANCHARD

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketProbate Of Will Hearing: (2:10 PM) (Judicial OfficerAllen, Brooke U.) : Email mblanchard@mdblawafw.com

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketCorrespondence Index #7: Re Filings

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketWaiver of Citation/Service Index #6: and Consent to Probate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketProof of Death and other Facts Index #5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketWill - Original Index #4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-113651: Howard, Elizabeth: (268.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Applicant Howard, Elizabeth T.; Total Financial Assessment: 268.00; Total Payments and Credits: 268.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 268.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketCitation - Poster: Return Date 03/15/2021; Public Notice: Served: 03/04/2021; Returned: 03/05/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketCorrespondence Index #3: Letter to Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketWill - Copy Index #2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketApplication for Muniment of Title Index #1: Pd $2 JF Pd $10 CC

    Read MoreRead Less