Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 04/25/2021 at 06:08:14 (UTC).

In the Estate of John Loys Wallace, Deceased

Case Summary

On 03/01/2021 In the Estate of John Loys Wallace, Deceased was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, Probate Court #2 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Allen, Brooke U. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********46-2

  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Probate Court #2

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Allen, Brooke U

 

Party Details

Not Classified By Court

Unknown, Missing, or Incapacitated Heir

Applicants and Executors

Hill, Elizabeth D.

Hill, Elizabeth D. Also Known As Hill, Elizabeth Also Known As Hill, Elizabeth D'Ann Wallace Also Known As Wallace, Elizabeth D'Ann

Colleyville, TX 76034

Decedent

Wallace, John Loys

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant and Executor Attorney

Cary Schroeder

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketProof of Death and other Facts Index #10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketOath Index #9

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • Docket306 Notice Index #8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketOrder Admit Will to Probate & Granting Letters Testamentary Index #7: Without Letters

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketProbate Of Will Hearing: (10:40 AM) (Judicial OfficerAllen, Brooke U.) : Email schroederlawfirm@gmail.com bryanandbethhill@gmail.com

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-114911: Hill, Elizabeth D'Ann Wallace: (17.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • FinancialTransaction Assessment: 17.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketHearing Setting Letter Index #6: April 19, 2021 @ 10:40 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketRequest Index #5: Paid $4 JF, Paid $6 Letters, Paid $5 Certified, Paid $2 Copies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketCitation - Poster: Return Date 3/15/21; Public Notice: Served: 03/04/2021; Returned: 03/05/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketWill - Original Index #3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-113656: Hill, Elizabeth D.: (256.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Applicant Hill, Elizabeth D.; Total Financial Assessment: 273.00; Total Payments and Credits: 273.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 256.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketProbate Supplemental Case Information Sheet Index #4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketWill - Copy Index #2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketApplication for Probate of Will Index #1: Owes $4 JF & Ltrs

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Cary Schroeder