Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 03/06/2019 at 01:15:07 (UTC).

In the Estate of John Homer Gibbs, Deceased

Case Summary

On 12/07/2017 In the Estate of John Homer Gibbs, Deceased was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, Probate Court #2 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Allen, Brooke U. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********31-2

  • Filing Date:

    12/07/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Probate Court #2

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Allen, Brooke U

 

Party Details

Applicant

Schultz, Carter

Southlake, TX 76092

Not Classified By Court

Unknown, Missing, or Incapacitated Heir

Gibbs, Elaine C.

Keller, TX 76248

Decedent

Gibbs, John Homer

Interested Parties and Not Classified By Court

Gibbs, Elaine C.

Keller, TX 76248

Lack, Sandra Gibbs

Fort Worth, TX 76133

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant Attorney

GILLAND CHENAULT

Not Classified By Court Attorneys

John C. Arneson

David C. Bakutis

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/12/2018
  • Order Approving Settlement Agreement Doc ID#20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • Order Appointing Attorney Ad Litem Doc ID#19: 817-305-0607

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • Administration with Will Annexed Hearing: (2:30 PM) (Judicial OfficerAllen, Brooke U.) : Contest court reporter requested

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • Hearing Setting Letter Doc ID#18: August 30, 2018 @ 2:30

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • Pre-Trial Hearing: (9:00 AM) (Judicial OfficerAllen, Brooke U.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • Application to Approve Settlement Agreement Doc ID#17: Joint Motion to Approve Compormise Family Settelment Agreement & Mutual Release

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2018
  • Order for Continuance Doc ID#16: July 26, 2018 @ 9 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2018
  • Motion for Continuance Doc ID#15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2018
  • Pre-Trial Hearing: (1:00 PM) (Judicial OfficerAllen, Brooke U.) : 05/16/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2018
  • Correspondence Doc ID#14: From Judge To Gilland Chenault and Elaine Gibbs RE: Trial Setting

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 12/07/2017
  • Will - Copy Doc ID#2: Page 9 is missing from copy

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2017
  • Application for Indep Admin with Will Annex 401.002b Doc ID#1: Paid $4 JF, Paid $10 for Letters

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • Counter Payment: Receipt # PR-0341881: Gibbs, Elaine C.: (120.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • Financial Information: Contestant Gibbs, Elaine C.; Total Financial Assessment: 120.00; Total Payments and Credits: 120.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 120.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • eFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-84466: Schultz, Carter: (2.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • Transaction Assessment: 2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • eFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-80374: Schultz, Carter: (192.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • Transaction Assessment: 192.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • eFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-79409: SCHULTZ, CARTER: (270.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • Financial Information: Applicant Schultz, Carter; Total Financial Assessment: 464.00; Total Payments and Credits: 464.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 270.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer John C. Arneson

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David C. Bakutis