Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 06/20/2018 at 23:49:38 (UTC).

In the Estate of John E. Gandy, Deceased

Case Summary

On 12/20/2017 In the Estate of John E Gandy, Deceased was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, Probate Court #1 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is King, Steve M. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********13-1

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Probate Court #1

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

King, Steve M

 

Party Details

Not Classified By Court

Unknown, Missing, or Incapacitated Heir

Applicant

Plunkett, Janis D. Also Known As Darlene, Janis

North Richland Hills, TX 76180

Decedent

Gandy, John E. Also Known As Gandy, John E., JR Also Known As Gandy, John Elliott

North Richland Hills, TX 76180

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant Attorney

Shawn Crawford

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/13/2018
  • Affidavit of Compliance Doc ID#12: Janis Plunkket

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • Certified Copy Doc ID#11: of Will and Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • Order Admit Will to Probate as Muniment of Title Doc ID#10: Affidavit of Compliance is hereby waived

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • Proof of Death and other Facts Doc ID#9

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • Muniment of Title Hearing: (11:00 AM) (Judicial OfficerKing, Steve M.) : Result: Order Signed: Comp aff waived.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2017
  • Declination to Serve Doc ID#8: John C. Gandy

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2017
  • Declination to Serve Doc ID#7: Mona Maxine Gandy

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • Correspondence Doc ID#6: Re: To Will

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • Will - Original Doc ID#5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Probate Supplemental Case Information Sheet Doc ID#4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Civil Case Information Sheet Doc ID#3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Citation - Poster: Return Date 01/01/2018; Public Notice: Served: 12/21/2017; Returned: 12/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Will - Copy Doc ID#2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Application for Muniment of Title Doc ID#1: Pd $2 JF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • Counter Payment: Receipt # PR-0341641: Crawford, Shawn: (13.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • Financial Information: Attorney Crawford, Shawn; Total Financial Assessment: 13.00; Total Payments and Credits: 13.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 13.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • eFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-79644: Plunkett, Janis D.: (258.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Financial Information: Applicant Plunkett, Janis D.; Total Financial Assessment: 258.00; Total Payments and Credits: 258.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 258.00

    Read MoreRead Less