Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 04/26/2021 at 20:49:26 (UTC).

In the Estate of John D. Stuart, Deceased

Case Summary

On 12/10/2020 In the Estate of John D Stuart, Deceased was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, Probate Court #1 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is McGown, Quentin. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********76-1

  • Filing Date:

    12/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Probate Court #1

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

McGown, Quentin

 

Party Details

Applicant

Stuart, Susan E.

Azle, TX 76020

Not Classified By Court

Unknown, Missing, or Incapacitated Heir

Decedent

Stuart, John D.

Azle, TX 76020

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant Attorney

Tyler A. Harden

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/22/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-114753: Stuart, John D.: (23.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Decedent Stuart, John D.; Total Financial Assessment: 23.00; Total Payments and Credits: 23.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 23.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketCertified Copy Index # 13: CC of Application , Will and Order Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketRequest Index # 12: for Certified Copies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketAssoc. Judge Order Approved by Presiding Judge

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketProof of Death and other Facts Index # 11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketProof of Handwriting & Signature Index # 10: Courtney Allen

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketProof of Handwriting & Signature Index # 9

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • Docket306 Notice Index # 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketOrder Admit Will to Probate as Muniment of Title Index # 7: Compliance Affidavit Waived

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketMuniment of Title Hearing: (9:45 AM) (Judicial Officer McGown, Quentin) : via zoom / comp aff waived

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketHearing Setting Letter Index # 6: March 16, 2021 @ 9:45 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketHearing Setting Letter Index # 5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • DocketWill - Original Index # 4: Holographic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-110767: Stuart, Susan E.: (258.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Applicant Stuart, Susan E.; Total Financial Assessment: 258.00; Total Payments and Credits: 258.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 258.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketCitation - Poster: Return Date 12/28/2020; Public Notice: Served: 12/17/2020; Returned: 12/18/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketWill - Copy Index # 3: Holographic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketProbate Supplemental Case Information Sheet Index # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketApplication for Muniment of Title Index # 1: Pd $2 JF, Attached Exhibit A Will

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Tyler A. Harden