Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 04/10/2021 at 06:09:23 (UTC).

In the Estate of John Curtis Molder, Deceased

Case Summary

On 03/03/2021 In the Estate of John Curtis Molder, Deceased was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, Probate Court #1 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Ponder, Christopher W. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********06-1

  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Probate Court #1

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Ponder, Christopher W

 

Party Details

Applicant

Molder, James M.

Decatur, TX 76234

Not Classified By Court

Unknown, Missing, or Incapacitated Heir

Decedent

Molder, John Curtis

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant Attorney

Nicholas Randal Harper

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketProbate Of Will Hearing: (3:00 PM) (Judicial OfficerPonder, Christopher W.) : via zoom

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketHearing Setting Letter Index #7: May 05, 2021 at 3:00 p.m. Via Zoom

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketWill - Original Index #6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketCitation - Poster: Return Date 3/15/21; Public Notice: Served: 03/04/2021; Returned: 03/05/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-113823: Molder, James M.: (264.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Applicant Molder, James M.; Total Financial Assessment: 264.00; Total Payments and Credits: 264.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 264.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketCorrespondence Index #5: Letter to Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketWill - Copy Index #4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketProbate Supplemental Case Information Sheet Index #3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Information Sheet Index #2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketApplication for Probate of Will Index #1: Owes $4 JF PD $8 ltrs

    Read MoreRead Less