This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 06/14/2020 at 09:49:29 (UTC).

In the Estate of Joan Miller Jones, Deceased

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 In the Estate of Joan Miller Jones, Deceased was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, Probate Court #2 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Allen, Brooke U. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********39-2

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Probate Court #2

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Allen, Brooke U

 

Party Details

Not Classified By Court

Unknown, Missing, or Incapacitated Heir

Decedent

Jones, Joan Miller

Arlington, TX 76012

Applicant and Executor

Jones, Bethany Anne

Arlington, TX 76012

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant and Executor Attorney

William L. Dismuke

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/24/2020
  • Docket306 Notice Index #17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • DocketOrder Extending Time to File Inventory & Appraisement Index #16: Extended till August 2, 2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-102108: Jones, Bethany Anne: (2.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • FinancialTransaction Assessment: 2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • DocketApplication for Extension of Time to File Inventory & App. Index #15: 8/2/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketAttorney's Certificate of Compliance 308.004 Index #14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketNotice to Creditors Index #13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • FinancialPayment: Receipt # PR-0356528: Jones, Bethany Anne: (2.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • FinancialCounter Payment: Receipt # PR-0356527: Jones, Bethany Anne: (23.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • FinancialTransaction Assessment: 23.00

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 01/15/2020
  • DocketAffidavit of 308 Notice Index #7: and Waiver of Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketHearing Setting Letter Index #6: 2/3/2020 2:00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • DocketWill - Original Index #5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-98369: Jones, Bethany Anne: (268.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Applicant Jones, Bethany Anne; Total Financial Assessment: 295.00; Total Payments and Credits: 295.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 268.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCitation - Poster: Return Date 12/23/2019; Public Notice: Served: 12/10/2019; Returned: 12/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketProbate Supplemental Case Information Sheet Index #4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Information Sheet Index #3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketWill - Copy Index #2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketApplication for Probate of Will Index #1: Pd $4 JF, Pd $8 Letters

    Read MoreRead Less