This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 04/10/2021 at 06:08:03 (UTC).

In the Estate of Joan Loffland Russey, Deceased

Case Summary

On 03/03/2021 In the Estate of Joan Loffland Russey, Deceased was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, Probate Court #1 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Ponder, Christopher W. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********11-1

  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Probate Court #1

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Ponder, Christopher W

 

Party Details

Applicants

Russey, Charles Bennett

Fort Worth, TX 76114

Brackett, A. William

Fort Worth, TX 76107-1618

Not Classified By Court

Unknown, Missing, or Incapacitated Heir

Decedent

Russey, Joan Loffland

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant Attorney

Ronald L. Adams

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketProbate Of Will Hearing: (2:00 PM) (Judicial OfficerPonder, Christopher W.) : via zoom

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-114283: Russey, Charles Bennett: (4.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • FinancialTransaction Assessment: 4.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketHearing Setting Letter Index #5: 05/04/2021 @2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketWill - Original Index #4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketCitation - Poster: Return Date 3/15/20; Public Notice: Served: 03/04/2021; Returned: 03/05/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-113831: Russey, Charles Bennett: (264.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Applicant Russey, Charles Bennett; Total Financial Assessment: 268.00; Total Payments and Credits: 268.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 264.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketProbate Supplemental Case Information Sheet Index #3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketWill - Copy Index #2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketApplication for Probate of Will Index #1: Owes $4 JF, Paid $8 Ltrs

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ronald L. Adams