Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 04/12/2021 at 16:16:18 (UTC).

In the Estate of Jesse Martinez, Deceased

Case Summary

On 11/17/2020 In the Estate of Jesse Martinez, Deceased was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, Probate Court #2 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Kelly, Lynn. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********54-2

  • Filing Date:

    11/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Probate Court #2

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Kelly, Lynn

 

Party Details

Decedent

Martinez, Jesse

Fort Worth, TX 76179

Applicants

Martinez, Margaret

Martinez, Margaret Also Known As Martinez, Margaret Suzanne

Fort Worth, TX 76108

Not Classified By Court

Unknown, Missing, or Incapacitated Heir

Interested Party

Martinez, Jim

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant Attorney

Andrew F Stasio, JR

Interested Party Attorney

Jason Michael Amon

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketProbate Of Will Hearing: (2:20 PM) (Judicial OfficerKelly, Lynn)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketHearing Setting Letter Index #13: 05/19/2021 at 2:20 pm

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketWaiver of 308 Index #12: Sealy Ann Martinez

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketWill - Original Index #11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketAmended Appl for Probate of Will Index #10: Third

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketWaiver Index #9: of Notice 258.002 - Jim Martinez

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketAmended Appl for Probate of Will Index #8: Second

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketAmended Appl for Probate of Will Index #7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketCANCELED: Probate Of Will Hearing; (10:20 AM) (Judicial OfficerKelly, Lynn) ; Case Not Ready; andrew.stasio@stasiolawfirm.com info@jasonamon.com COPY OF WILL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketNotice of Appearance by Attorney Index #6: for Jim Martinez

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-110488: Martinez, Margaret: (14.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • FinancialTransaction Assessment: 14.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketHearing Setting Letter Index #5: January 29th, 2021 at 10:20am via Zoom

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • DocketCitation - Poster: Return Date 11/30/2020; Public Notice: Served: 11/19/2020; Returned: 11/20/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-109932: Martinez, Margaret: (256.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Applicant Martinez, Margaret; Total Financial Assessment: 270.00; Total Payments and Credits: 270.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 256.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketProbate Supplemental Case Information Sheet Index #4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Information Sheet Index #3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketApplication for Probate of Will Index #2: Owes $4 JF Owes Letters

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketWill - Copy Index #1

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jason Michael Amon