This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 03/27/2021 at 06:09:36 (UTC).

In the Estate of Jerry R. Young, Deceased

Case Summary

On 03/03/2021 In the Estate of Jerry R Young, Deceased was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, Probate Court #1 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Ponder, Christopher W. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********09-1

  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Probate Court #1

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Ponder, Christopher W

 

Party Details

Applicants

YOUNG II, JERRY R.

Larue, TX 75770

Young, Jerry R., II

Larue, TX 75770

Not Classified By Court

Unknown, Missing, or Incapacitated Heir

Decedent

YOUNG, JERRY R.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant Attorney

J C Bailey, III

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketProbate Of Will Hearing: (3:45 PM) (Judicial OfficerPonder, Christopher W.) : via zoom

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketCitation - Poster: Return Date 03/15/2021; Public Notice: Served: 03/04/2021; Returned: 03/05/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketWill - Original Index #4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-113828: YOUNG II, JERRY R.: (270.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Applicant Young, Jerry R., II; Total Financial Assessment: 270.00; Total Payments and Credits: 270.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 270.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketAmended Appl for Probate of Will Index #5: First

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketProbate Supplemental Case Information Sheet Index #3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketWill - Copy Index #2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketApplication for Probate of Will Index #1: Pd $4 JF, Pd $10 Letters

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer J C Bailey, III