Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 08/03/2021 at 07:08:44 (UTC).

In the Estate of Jay Dee Henry, Deceased

Case Summary

On 03/26/2021 In the Estate of Jay Dee Henry, Deceased was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, Probate Court #1 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Ponder, Christopher W. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********75-1

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Probate Court #1

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Ponder, Christopher W

 

Party Details

Not Classified By Court

Unknown, Missing, or Incapacitated Heir

Decedent

Henry, Jay Dee

Fort Worth, TX 76140

Executor and Applicant

Henry, John Lee

Fort Worth, TX 76140

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Executor and Applicant Attorney

James D. Schull

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/29/2021
  • Docket306 Notice Index # 7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketOrder Admit Will to Probate & Granting Letters Testamentary Index # 6: No Bond

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketProbate Of Will Hearing: (3:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Ponder, Christopher W.) : via zoom

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-120242: Henry, John Lee: (12.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • FinancialTransaction Assessment: 12.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketHearing Setting Letter Index # 5: 7/29/21 @ 3:30

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketWill - Original Index # 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketCitation - Poster: Return Date 04/12/2021; Public Notice: Served: 04/01/2021; Returned: 04/05/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-115004: Henry, John Lee: (266.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Applicant Henry, John Lee; Total Financial Assessment: 278.00; Total Payments and Credits: 278.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 266.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketProbate Supplemental Case Information Sheet Index # 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketWill - Copy Index # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketApplication for Probate of Will Index # 1: Owes $2 JF Pd $2 JF Pd $8 Letters

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer James D. Schull