Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 04/16/2021 at 06:12:41 (UTC).

In the Estate of Janet Sue Elliston, Deceased

Case Summary

On 03/01/2021 In the Estate of Janet Sue Elliston, Deceased was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, Probate Court #2 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Kelly, Lynn. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********58-2

  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Probate Court #2

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Kelly, Lynn

 

Party Details

Not Classified By Court

Unknown, Missing, or Incapacitated Heir

Decedent

Elliston, Janet Sue

Applicant

Legate, Teri Also Known As Legate, Teri Easterling Also Known As Legate, Terry Deeann Also Known As Legate, Terry Teri Deeann Elliston Easterling

Talco, TX 75487

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant Attorney

Laurie Weir

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketProbate Of Will Hearing: (10:20 AM) (Judicial OfficerKelly, Lynn)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-114935: Legate, Teri: (2.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • FinancialTransaction Assessment: 2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketHearing Setting Letter Index #5: 05/14/2021 at 10:20 am

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketWill - Original Index #4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-113691: Legate, Teri: (256.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Applicant Legate, Teri; Total Financial Assessment: 258.00; Total Payments and Credits: 258.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 256.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketCitation - Poster: Return Date 03/15/2021; Public Notice: Served: 03/04/2021; Returned: 03/05/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketProbate Supplemental Case Information Sheet Index #3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketWill - Copy Index #2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketApplication for Probate of Will Index #1: Owes $4 JF and Letters

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Laurie Weir