This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 08/27/2018 at 06:41:12 (UTC).

In the Estate of James Eugene Davidson, Deceased

Case Summary

On 03/08/2018 In the Estate of James Eugene Davidson, Deceased was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, Probate Court #1 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is King, Steve M. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********03-1

  • Filing Date:

    03/08/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

King, Steve M

 

Party Details

Decedent

Davidson, James Eugene

Not Classified By Court

Unknown, Missing, or Incapacitated Heir

Applicant and Executor

Davidson, Bettye Gay

Fort Worth, TX 76116

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant and Executor Attorneys

Catherine M Norman

Catherine M. Norman

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/25/2018
  • Notice to Creditors Doc ID#12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • Affidavit in Lieu of Inventory Doc ID#11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • Affidavit of 308 Notice Doc ID#10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • 306 Notice Doc ID#9

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Oath Doc ID#8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Order Admit Will to Probate & Granting Letters Testamentary Doc ID#7: no bond

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Proof of Death and other Facts Doc ID#6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Probate Of Will Hearing: (3:15 PM) (Judicial OfficerKing, Steve M.) : Result: Order Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • Will - Original Doc ID#5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • Citation - Poster: Ret. Date 03/26/2018; Public Notice: Served: 03/14/2018; Returned: 03/15/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • Probate Supplemental Case Information Sheet Doc ID#4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • Civil Case Information Sheet Doc ID#3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • Will - Copy Doc ID#2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • Application for Probate of Will Doc ID#1: Pd $4.00 JFs, Pd $8.00 for Letters

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Counter Payment: Receipt # PR-0342848: Norman, Catherine M.: (35.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Financial Information: Attorney Norman, Catherine M.; Total Financial Assessment: 35.00; Total Payments and Credits: 35.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 35.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • eFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-81484: Davidson, Bettye Gay: (268.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • Financial Information: Applicant Davidson, Bettye Gay; Total Financial Assessment: 268.00; Total Payments and Credits: 268.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 268.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Catherine M. Norman