This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 06/12/2022 at 06:54:50 (UTC).

In The Estate of James Erwin Sullivan, Deceased

Case Summary

On 02/10/2022 In The Estate of James Erwin Sullivan, Deceased was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, Probate Court #1 located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********96-1

  • Filing Date:

    02/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Claimants

Discover Bank.

965 Keynote Circle

Cleveland, OH 44131-9916

c/o Weltman, Weinberg & Reis, Co

Key Bank, N. A.

800 Pencader Drive

Newark, DE 19702

c/o Simm Associates, Inc.

Applicant

Sullivan, Tiffany Marlo

Fort Worth, TX 76132

Decedent

Sullivan, James Erwin

Not Classified By Court

Unknown, Missing, or Incapacitated Heir

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant Attorney

Jason Michael Amon

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Clayton L. Everett

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/22/2022
  • FinancialMail: Receipt # PR-0367781: Key Bank, N. A.: (10.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Claimant Key Bank, N. A.; Total Financial Assessment: 10.00; Total Payments and Credits: 10.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • DocketReturn of Citation/Service - e-copy Index # 12:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • DocketMiscellaneous Document Index # 11: Proof of Eservice of Notice Letter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • DocketNotice of Claim Index # 10: $29,852.82 - Eserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • DocketClaim Index # 9: $29,852.82 - Acct. 619-001

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • FinancialMail: Receipt # PR-0367667: Discover Bank.: (10.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Claimant Discover Bank.; Total Financial Assessment: 10.00; Total Payments and Credits: 10.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • DocketMiscellaneous Document Index # 8: Proof of Eservice of Notice Letter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • DocketNotice of Claim Index # 7: $2,146.58 - Eserved

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 03/07/2022
  • DocketAnswer Attorney Ad Litem Index # 5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • Docket306 Notice Index # 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • DocketOrder Appointing Attorney Ad Litem Index # 3: 817-704-3984

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • FinancialState Credit: (137.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-128753: Sullivan, Tiffany Marlo: (346.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Applicant Sullivan, Tiffany Marlo; Total Financial Assessment: 483.00; Total Payments and Credits: 483.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 483.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • DocketCitation - Publication: Return Date 02/28/2022 Also Posted on OCA Website; Unknown, Missing, or Incapacitated Heir: Served: 02/17/2022; Returned: 03/22/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • DocketCitation - Poster: Return Date 02/28/2022; Public Notice: Served: 02/17/2022; Returned: 02/18/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • DocketProbate Supplemental Case Information Sheet Index # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • DocketApplication for Indep Admin 401.003 & Determine of Heirship Index # 1: Pd $4 JF, Pd $8 Letters, Pd $83 Pub

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KEY BANK OF CENTRAL MAINE is a litigant

Latest cases where C/O Simm Associates, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where C/O Weltman, Weinberg & Reis Co., LPA is a litigant

Latest cases where DISCOVER BANK is a litigant