This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 07/26/2022 at 21:21:47 (UTC).

In The Estate of James Bristol Thibodaux, Deceased

Case Summary

On 11/23/2021 In The Estate of James Bristol Thibodaux, Deceased was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, Probate Court #2 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Allen, Brooke U. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********11-2

  • Filing Date:

    11/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Allen, Brooke U

 

Party Details

Applicant and Executor

Thibodaux, Chandler Boyd Also Known As Thibodaux, Nancy Boyd

Fort Worth, TX 76179

Decedent

Thibodaux, James Bristol

Fort Worth, TX 76179

Not Classified By Court

Unknown, Missing, or Incapacitated Heir

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant and Executor Attorney

Creighton Maynard

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/10/2022
  • Docket306 Notice Index # 16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketOrder Approving Inventory, Appraisment & List of Claims Index # 15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • DocketAttorney's Certificate of Compliance 308.004 Index # 14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • DocketInventory Appraise Claims -no fee w/in 90 days qualification Index # 13: Inventory, Appraisement & List of Claims

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketNotice to Creditors Index # 12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • DocketRequest Index # 11: to have Letters mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • Docket306 Notice Index # 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • DocketProof of Death and other Facts Index # 10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • DocketOath Index # 9

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • DocketOrder Admit Will to Probate & Granting Letters Testamentary Index # 7: Without Bond

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • DocketProbate Of Will Hearing: (2:10 PM) (Judicial Officer Allen, Brooke U.) : Zoom Email office2@maynardlawfirms.com

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketHearing Setting Letter Index # 6: February 7th, 2022 at 02:10pm via Zoom

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketWill - Original Index # 5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketWaiver of 308 Index # 4: Chandler Thibodaux

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-125632: Thibodaux, Chandler Boyd: (268.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Applicant Thibodaux, Chandler Boyd; Total Financial Assessment: 268.00; Total Payments and Credits: 268.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 268.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketCitation - Poster: Return Date 12/06/2021; Public Notice: Served: 11/24/2021; Returned: 11/29/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketProbate Supplemental Case Information Sheet Index # 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketWill - Copy Index # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketApplication for Probate of Will Index # 1: Paid $4 JF $8 letters

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Creighton Maynard