This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 11/14/2021 at 06:06:30 (UTC).

In the Estate of Jack Dudly Tyler, JR, Deceased

Case Summary

On 10/21/2021 In the Estate of Jack Dudly Tyler, JR, Deceased was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, Probate Court #1 located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********45-1

  • Filing Date:

    10/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Decedent

Tyler, Jack Dudly, JR

Haltom City, TX 76117

Not Classified By Court

Tyler, Sarah Rebecca

Fort Worth, TX 76244

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Creighton Maynard

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketCorrespondence Index # 3: From Court RE: SEA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketCitation - Poster: Return Date 11/08/2021; Public Notice: Served: 10/25/2021; Returned: 10/26/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-124253: Tyler, Sarah Rebecca: (270.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Distributee Tyler, Sarah Rebecca; Total Financial Assessment: 270.00; Total Payments and Credits: 270.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 270.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketMiscellaneous Document Index # 2: Death Certificate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketSmall Estate Affidavit Index # 1: Pd $2 JF

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Creighton Maynard