This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 04/26/2022 at 17:17:26 (UTC).

In The Estate of Jack D. Tyler, Deceased

Case Summary

On 10/21/2021 In The Estate of Jack D Tyler, Deceased was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, Probate Court #2 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Allen, Brooke U. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********50-2

  • Filing Date:

    10/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Allen, Brooke U

 

Party Details

Applicant and Executor

Tyler, Rebecca Also Known As Tyler, Sarah Rebecca Price

Fort Worth, TX 76244

Decedent

Tyler, Jack D. Also Known As Tyler, J. D. Also Known As Tyler, Jack Dudly, SR

Fort Worth, TX 76244

Not Classified By Court

Unknown, Missing, or Incapacitated Heir

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant and Executor Attorney

Creighton Maynard

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/03/2022
  • DocketNotice to Creditors Index # 13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • DocketCorrespondence Index # 12: Letter to clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • DocketOath Index # 11: of No Debts

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • DocketOath Index # 10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • DocketProof of Death and other Facts Index # 9

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • Docket306 Notice Index # 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • DocketOrder Admit Will to Probate & Granting Letters Testamentary Index # 7: Without Bond

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • DocketProbate Of Will Hearing: (10:10 AM) (Judicial Officer Allen, Brooke U.) : Zoom Email office2@maynardlawfirms.com

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketHearing Setting Letter Index # 6: 01/31/2022 at 10:10 am

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketWaiver of 308 Index # 5: - Rebecca Tyler

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketWill - Original Index # 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-124372: Tyler, Rebecca: (268.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Applicant Tyler, Rebecca; Total Financial Assessment: 268.00; Total Payments and Credits: 268.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 268.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketCitation - Poster: Return Date11/08/21 RFC #58424114 10/22/21 @10:50 am; Public Notice: Served: 10/27/2021; Returned: 10/28/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketProbate Supplemental Case Information Sheet Index # 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketWill - Copy Index # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketApplication for Probate of Will Index # 1: Paid $4 JF $8 Letters

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Creighton Maynard