This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 04/10/2021 at 06:08:09 (UTC).

In the Estate of Imogene S. Mecaskey, Deceased

Case Summary

On 03/03/2021 In the Estate of Imogene S Mecaskey, Deceased was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, Probate Court #2 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Allen, Brooke U. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********10-2

  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Probate Court #2

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Allen, Brooke U

 

Party Details

Applicants

Nethery, Charlotte Mecaskey

Burleson, TX 76028

Nethery, Charlotte Mecaskey Also Known As Nethery, Charlotte Rene

Burleson, TX 76028

Decedent

Mecaskey, Imogene S.

Burleson, TX 76028

Not Classified By Court

Unknown, Missing, or Incapacitated Heir

Interested Parties

Owen, Harrold Dean, JR

North Richland Hills, TX 76180

Owen, H. Dean, JR

North Richland Hills, TX 76180

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant Attorney

H. Dean Owen, JR

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketProbate Of Will Hearing: (2:30 PM) (Judicial OfficerAllen, Brooke U.) : Email deanowen21@gmail.com

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketWill - Original Index #4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketCitation - Poster: Return Date 3/15/21; Public Notice: Served: 03/04/2021; Returned: 03/05/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-113829: Nethery, Charlotte Mecaskey: (256.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Applicant Nethery, Charlotte Mecaskey; Total Financial Assessment: 256.00; Total Payments and Credits: 256.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 256.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketProbate Supplemental Case Information Sheet Index #3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketWill - Copy Index #2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketApplication for Probate of Will Index #1: Owes $4 JF & Ltrs

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer H. Dean Owen, JR