This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 08/08/2022 at 12:02:35 (UTC).

In The Estate of Horace L. Rogers, Deceased

Case Summary

On 03/10/2022 In The Estate of Horace L Rogers, Deceased was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, Probate Court #2 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Allen, Brooke U. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********91-2

  • Filing Date:

    03/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Allen, Brooke U

 

Party Details

Applicant

Rogers, Sharon B.

Fort Worth, TX 76103

Decedent

Rogers, Horace L.

Not Classified By Court

Unknown, Missing, or Incapacitated Heir

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant Attorney

Matthew L. Davidson

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/13/2022
  • Docket306 Notice Index # 11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • DocketCertified Copy Index # 10: 3 Will and Orders

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • DocketOrder Admit Will to Probate as Muniment of Title Index # 9

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • DocketProof of Death and other Facts Index # 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • DocketConsent to Appointment Index # 7: Wade A. Rogers

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • DocketMuniment of Title Hearing: (1:15 PM) (Judicial Officer Allen, Brooke U.) : In Person

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-135033: Rogers, Sharon B.: (78.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • FinancialTransaction Assessment: 78.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • DocketRequest Index # 6: Certified Copies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-134971: Rogers, Sharon B.: (4.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 03/29/2022
  • FinancialCounter Payment: Receipt # PR-0367895: Davidson, Matthew L.: (2.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • FinancialTransaction Assessment: 2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • DocketWill - Original Index # 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • FinancialState Credit: (137.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-130065: Rogers, Sharon B.: (251.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Applicant Rogers, Sharon B.; Total Financial Assessment: 472.00; Total Payments and Credits: 472.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 388.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketCitation - Poster: Return Date 03/28/2022; Public Notice: Served: 03/15/2022; Returned: 03/16/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • DocketWill - Copy Index # 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • DocketApplication for Muniment of Title Index # 2: Owes $2 JF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • DocketProbate Supplemental Case Information Sheet Index # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew L Davidson